LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR27
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR27
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR27
Compare Versions
SCR27 Chaptered May 16, 2012
SCR27 Enrolled May 15, 2012
SCR27 Amended April 9, 2012
SCR27 Amended March 26, 2012
SCR27 Introduced March 21, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SCR27 Chaptered May 16, 2012
SCR27 Enrolled May 15, 2012
SCR27 Amended April 9, 2012
SCR27 Amended March 26, 2012
SCR27 Introduced March 21, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare