|
09/15/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 94, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2011
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (September 9). Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3241.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2254.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2043.) (August 23).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set for hearing August 23.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|