California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR52 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 23, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 15, 2011

Amended

Bill August 25, 2011
Bill August 16, 2011