04/23/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2012. | |||
04/23/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
04/19/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3217.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
04/17/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
04/16/2012 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4373.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
09/08/2011 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
09/08/2011 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2400.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
09/07/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/17/2011 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |