California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR55 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2012

Chaptered

Bill April 23, 2012

Amended

Bill April 16, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012