05/31/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/31/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
05/29/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3666.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
05/23/2012 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |||
05/10/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4790.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/03/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/15/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
03/15/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2950.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
03/07/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/13/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |