LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR64
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR64
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR64
Compare Versions
SCR64 Chaptered May 31, 2012
SCR64 Enrolled May 30, 2012
SCR64 Amended May 1, 2012
SCR64 Amended April 9, 2012
SCR64 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SCR64 Chaptered May 31, 2012
SCR64 Enrolled May 30, 2012
SCR64 Amended May 1, 2012
SCR64 Amended April 9, 2012
SCR64 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare