California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR74 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2012

Amended

Bill March 27, 2012
Bill March 26, 2012