LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR74
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR74
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR74
Compare Versions
SCR74 Chaptered September 10, 2012
SCR74 Enrolled September 6, 2012
SCR74 Amended March 27, 2012
SCR74 Amended March 26, 2012
SCR74 Introduced March 13, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SCR74 Chaptered September 10, 2012
SCR74 Enrolled September 6, 2012
SCR74 Amended March 27, 2012
SCR74 Amended March 26, 2012
SCR74 Introduced March 13, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare