08/24/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/24/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | |||
08/21/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4647.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/16/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
08/16/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5965.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/09/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |||
08/06/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/19/2012 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/04/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
05/17/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/17/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3529.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/09/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/10/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |