California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR82 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 10, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012