|
08/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 94, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4618.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. (Corrected August 23.)
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5899.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5846.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the resolution was read, adopted, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5482.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3790.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|