California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR96 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 4, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 13, 2012
Bill August 9, 2012