California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR96 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/09/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 96AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 9, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Corbett JUNE 4, 2012 Relative to Philippine Independence Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 96, as amended, Corbett. Philippine Independence Day. This measure would recognize June 12, 2012, as the 114th Anniversary of Philippine Independence, and would call upon the people of the state to observe the month of June with appropriate ceremonies, programs, and activities. Fiscal committee: no. WHEREAS, On June 12, 2012, the  Filipino-American   Filipino American  community will celebrate the 114th Anniversary of Philippine Independence, and on this occasion it is appropriate to make special recognition of California's  Filipino-American   Filipino Americans  citizens and thank them for their countless contributions to our nation's cultural, economic, and political heritage; and WHEREAS, The Philippine Declaration of Independence took place on June 12, 1898, in the town of  Cavite-Viejo   Cavite el Viejo  (now known as Kawit) in the province of Cavite in the Philippines when Filipino revolutionary forces under the leadership of General Emilio Aguinaldo publicly read the Act of Declaration of Independence proclaiming the sovereignty and independence of the Philippine Islands from the colonial rule of Spain, after United States and Filipino revolutionary forces defeated Spain at the Battle of Manila Bay during the Spanish-American War; and WHEREAS, The declaration was not recognized by the United States or Spain. Spain later ceded the Philippines to the United States in the 1898 Treaty of Paris that ended the Spanish-American War. The United States government did not recognize Philippine Independence until the signing of the Treaty of Manila on July 4, 1946; and WHEREAS, For nearly two decades, July 4 was observed in the Philippines as Independence Day until President  Diosado   Diosdado  Macapagal, upon the advice of historians and the urging of nationalists, signed the Republic Act No. 4166 into law on August 4, 1964, designating the country's Independence Day as June 12. June 12 had previously been observed as Flag Day and on that day many government buildings had been urged to display the Philippine flag in their offices; and WHEREAS, As the years went on,  Filipino-Americans   Filipino Americans  became very involved in the community and made numerous contributions in all aspects of American society and culture, especially in California; and WHEREAS,  Filipino-Americans   Filipino Americans  have also played a major role in California politics. There have been city mayors and other public officials who have shaped the development of California over the years who have been of Filipino descent; including,  "Tita"   Tita  Alice Bulos  ,  also known as the  Grandmother   Godmother  of  Filipino-American   Filipino American  politics, our very own Chief Justice of California Tani Cantil-Sakauye, Mona Pasquil, former acting Lieutenant Governor of California, the Mayor of  Milipitas   Milpitas  Jose Esteves, Union City Council Members Jim Navarro and Pat Gacoscos, Daly City Vice Mayor Ray  Bueneventura   Buenarentura  , Daly City Council Member Mike Guingona, and Alameda Vice Mayor Rob Bonta; and WHEREAS, Many people of Filipino descent have contributed to great movements that have helped to shape our country and its role in the world, including the late Larry Dulay Itliong, labor organizer and the first vice president of the United Farm Workers Union; and the late, Philip  Veracruz   VeraCruz  , cofounder of the United Farm Workers Union; and WHEREAS, Many  Filipino-Americans   Filipino Americans  have served with distinction as outstanding soldiers who fought as members of the United States Armed Forces for over a century and have sacrificed their lives in many wars, including World War II; and WHEREAS, Today there are 3.4 million people of  Filipino-American   Filipino Americans  descent, many of whom have played vital roles in the development of the United States and have paved the way for many  Filipino-Americans   Filipino Americans  to continue to strengthen their roles in the broader society  ;   ,  and to contribute to American and California politics, economy, and culture; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature, in honor of the multitude of contributions that  Filipino-Americans   Filipino Americans  have made to make this a better country and state for all people, recognizes June 12, 2012, as the 114th Anniversary of Philippine Independence and calls upon the people of the state to observe the month of June with appropriate ceremonies, programs, and activities; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.