|
08/31/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4961.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6447.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6087.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/04/2012
|
Set for hearing August 6.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4167.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|