LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR97
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR97
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR97
Compare Versions
SCR97 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SCR97 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SCR97 Amended August 22, 2012
SCR97 Amended June 14, 2012
SCR97 Introduced June 4, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SCR97 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SCR97 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SCR97 Amended August 22, 2012
SCR97 Amended June 14, 2012
SCR97 Introduced June 4, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare