08/31/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/31/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |||
08/27/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4857.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/24/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
08/23/2012 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6177.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
08/16/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/15/2012 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 14). | |||
08/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
05/31/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3751.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/16/2012 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |