California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR26 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/07/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SJR 26CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 107 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2012 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 27, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Vargas (Coauthors: Assembly Members Hueso and V. Manuel Prez) MAY 16, 2012 Relative to Naval Air Facility El Centro. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SJR 26, Vargas. The Naval Air Facility El Centro. This measure would urge the California delegates of Congress to protect the Naval Air Facility El Centro during any upcoming base realignment and closure processes. WHEREAS, United States Secretary of Defense, Leon Panetta, recently released the 2013 fiscal year defense budget proposal which includes a request for new base closures; and WHEREAS, The Naval Air Facility El Centro (NAF El Centro) might be under consideration for closure in the 2013 or 2015 closure periods; and WHEREAS, The NAF El Centro provides efficiencies and benefits to the Navy which include, but are not limited to, a strategic location near Marine Corps Air Stations and the naval fleet, proximity to ranges for different types of flights, and carrier training using the Fresnel Lens Optical Landing System and lighted carrier deck landing areas; and WHEREAS, The El Centro area provides clear weather and unobstructed terrain, which in turn provides ample low-level flying opportunities; and WHEREAS, No other region in the United States more closely resembles current combat areas of the world; and WHEREAS, The El Centro area provides a high quality of life for its residents and the NAF El Centro has enjoyed unparalleled community support since the establishment of the base, including support from the County of Imperial Board of Supervisors; and WHEREAS, Another base closure in California could have a devastating impact on the nation's security; and WHEREAS, The impact of the closure of the NAF El Centro goes beyond the employment of the base personnel, impacting local small businesses, schools, sales and property tax bases of the local community, the environment, the hospitality industry, the housing market, and the local, regional, and state economies; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate and the Assembly of the State of California, jointly, That the Legislature urges the representatives from California to the Congress of the United States to protect the NAF El Centro during any upcoming base realignment and closure processes; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Secretary of Defense of the United States, to the Majority Leader of the Senate, to the Speaker of the House of Representatives, to the minority leader of each house, to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States, and to the author for appropriate distribution.