|
10/01/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 460, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2229.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1576.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|