California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1004 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2013

Amended

Bill May 15, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013