Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Joint Rule JR 61(a)(10) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1820.) Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 1447.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|