California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1008 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 26, 2013
Bill July 8, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013