California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill May 28, 2014
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013