LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1014
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1014
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1014
Compare Versions
AB1014 Chaptered September 30, 2014
AB1014 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB1014 Amended August 21, 2014
AB1014 Amended August 18, 2014
AB1014 Amended August 4, 2014
AB1014 Amended July 2, 2014
AB1014 Amended June 11, 2014
AB1014 Amended May 28, 2014
AB1014 Amended May 8, 2013
AB1014 Amended April 24, 2013
AB1014 Amended April 9, 2013
AB1014 Amended March 21, 2013
AB1014 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1014 Chaptered September 30, 2014
AB1014 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB1014 Amended August 21, 2014
AB1014 Amended August 18, 2014
AB1014 Amended August 4, 2014
AB1014 Amended July 2, 2014
AB1014 Amended June 11, 2014
AB1014 Amended May 28, 2014
AB1014 Amended May 8, 2013
AB1014 Amended April 24, 2013
AB1014 Amended April 9, 2013
AB1014 Amended March 21, 2013
AB1014 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare