|
03/06/2014
|
Last day to consider Governor's item veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's item veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
Approved by the Governor with item veto.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3311.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3147.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2251.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1698.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|