California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1042 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2013

Amended

Bill August 12, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013