Senate | 06/20/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 1464.) | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2013 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 10). | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |