California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1073 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/18/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1073AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 18, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Torres FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to add Section 8585.6 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1073, as amended, Torres. Emergency services: utility access. Existing law requires the Office of Emergency Services, as established by the Governor's Reorganization Plan No. 2, operative July 1, 2013, to establish by rule and regulation various classes of disaster service workers and the scope of the duties of each class. Existing law requires the office to also adopt rules and regulations prescribing the manner in which disaster service workers of each class are to be registered. Existing law authorizes the office to establish a statewide registry of private businesses and nonprofit organizations that are interested in donating services, goods, labor, equipment, resources, or dispensaries or other facilities for disaster preparedness. This bill would require the office to develop,  in collaboration with the Public Utilities Commission   on or before January 1, 2015  , a universal insignia that may be displayed on badges worn by a properly qualified and certified utility worker or technician that would enable the person to gain access to a location subject to a disaster or other emergency to provide vital utility services, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8585.6 is added to the Government Code, to read: 8585.6. (a) The office shall develop,  in collaboration with the Public Utilities Commission   on or before January 1, 2015  , a universal insignia that may be displayed on badges worn by a properly qualified and certified utility worker or technician that shall enable the person to gain access to a location subject to a disaster or other emergency to provide vital utility services, including, but not limited to, shutting off water mains, gas mains, or electric power connections, and the suspension or restoration of utility services. (b)  Each private or public utility corporation   The office  shall be responsible for determining the qualification and certification process that would allow a utility worker or technician to display the insignia provided for in subdivision (a).