California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1096 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/23/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1096AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 23, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 2, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 23, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 14, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Nestande (Coauthor: Assembly Member V. Manuel Prez) FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to add Section 5162 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1096, as amended, Nestande. Vehicles: specialized license plates: Salton Sea. Under existing law, a state agency is authorized to apply to the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) to sponsor a specialized license plate program, and the DMV is required to issue those license plates if the agency meets certain requirements. Existing law also requires the DMV to charge specified fees for certain services related to the issuance of those plates.  Under existing law, the Salton Sea Authority, a joint powers authority, is authorized to form an infrastructure financing district for purposes of restoring the Salton Sea.  This bill would  authorize   require  the Department of Fish and Wildlife to apply to the DMV to sponsor a special Salton Sea license plate program, and would require the DMV to issue the license plates if the Department of Fish and Wildlife meets certain requirements.  The bill would require the plates issued under the program to bear a full-plate graphic design, as specified, and would require the payment of an additional fee by a person applying for the special plate.  The bill would also require the revenue generated from the license plates, as specified, to be deposited in the Salton Sea Restoration Account created by the bill in the Specialized License Plate Fund  , for use, upon appropriation by the Legislature to the Salton Sea Authority, for restoring the Salton Sea  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 5162 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 5162. (a) The Department of Fish and Wildlife  may   shall  apply to the department, pursuant to Section 5156, to sponsor a Salton Sea license plate program. The department shall issue specialized license plates for that program if the Department of Fish and Wildlife complies with the requirements of Section 5156.  (b) Notwithstanding Section 5155, the Salton Sea license plates shall bear a full-plate graphic that the department determines, in consultation with the Department of the California Highway Patrol, does not obscure the readability of the license plate, and that depicts an image to be designated by the Department of Fish and Wildlife.   (c)   (b)  Notwithstanding subdivision (c) of Section 5157, the additional fees prescribed by Section 5157 for the issuance, renewal, or transfer of the specialized license plates shall be deposited, after the department deducts its administrative costs, in the Salton Sea Restoration Account, which is hereby created in the Specialized License Plate Fund.  The funds   in the account shall be used, upon appropriation by the Legislature to the Salton Sea Authority, for restoration of the Salton Sea.