California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1096 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill May 2, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill March 14, 2013