LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1096
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1096
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1096
Compare Versions
AB1096 Chaptered September 16, 2014
AB1096 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1096 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1096 Amended May 23, 2014
AB1096 Amended May 2, 2013
AB1096 Amended April 23, 2013
AB1096 Amended March 14, 2013
AB1096 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1096 Chaptered September 16, 2014
AB1096 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1096 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1096 Amended May 23, 2014
AB1096 Amended May 2, 2013
AB1096 Amended April 23, 2013
AB1096 Amended March 14, 2013
AB1096 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare