Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2334.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 1817.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|