California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1127 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 2, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013