|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 304, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1884.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 1466.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|