California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1136 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013

Amended

Bill April 15, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013
Bill March 20, 2013