|
09/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 325, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6033.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4298.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1388.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|