California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 15, 2014

Amended

Bill June 9, 2014
Bill April 22, 2013