|
09/06/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 244, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 2660.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1879.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 1466.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|