California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013

Amended

Bill June 19, 2013
Bill April 29, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013