Assembly | 04/29/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |