California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill January 23, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill April 25, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013