California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1193 Amended / Bill

Filed 01/06/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1193AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 6, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 21, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ting FEBRUARY 22, 2013 An act to amend  Section   Sections 890.4 and  891 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to bikeways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1193, as amended, Ting. Bikeways.  Existing law defines "bikeway" for certain purposes to mean all facilities that provide primarily for bicycle travel. Existing law categorizes bikeways into 3 classes of facilities.   This bill would additionally provide for a classification of Class IV bikeways, as specified.  Existing law requires the Department of Transportation, in cooperation with county and city governments, to establish minimum safety design criteria for the planning and construction of bikeways, and requires the department to establish uniform specifications and symbols regarding bicycle travel and bicycle traffic related matters. Existing law requires all city, county, regional, and other local agencies responsible for the development or operation of bikeways or roadways where bicycle travel is permitted to utilize all minimum safety design criteria and uniform specifications and symbols for signs, markers, and traffic control devices established pursuant to that law.  Existing law also requires the department, by June 30, 2013, to establish procedures to permit exceptions to the above requirements for purposes of research, experimentation, testing, evaluation, or verification.  This bill would  prohibit   require  the department  from denying funding to a project because it is excepted pursuant to these procedures   , in cooperation with local agencies, to establish minimum safety design criteria for Class IV bikeways  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION   1.   Section 890.4 of the   Streets and Highways Code  , as amended by Section   17 of Chapter 523 of the Statutes of 2013, is amended to read:  890.4. As used in this article, "bikeway" means all facilities that provide primarily for bicycle travel. For purposes of this article, bikeways shall be categorized as follows: (a) Class I bikeways, also known as "bike paths" or "shared-use paths," which provide a completely separated right-of-way designated for the exclusive use of bicycles and pedestrians with crossflows by motorists minimized. (b) Class II bikeways, also known as "bike lanes," which provide a restricted right-of-way designated for the exclusive or semiexclusive use of bicycles with through travel by motor vehicles or pedestrians prohibited, but with vehicle parking and crossflows by pedestrians and motorists permitted. (c) Class III bikeways, also known as onstreet or offstreet "bike routes," which provide a right-of-way designated by signs or permanent markings and shared with pedestrians and motorists.  (d) Class IV bikeways, also known as "cycletracks" or "protected bike lanes," which provide a right-of-way designated exclusively for bicycle travel within a roadway and which are protected from other vehicle traffic with devices, including, but not limited to, grade separation, flexible posts, inflexible physical barriers, or parked cars.   SECTION 1.   SEC. 2.  Section 891 of the Streets and Highways Code is amended to read: 891. (a) All city, county, regional, and other local agencies responsible for the development or operation of bikeways or roadways where bicycle travel is permitted shall utilize all minimum safety design criteria and uniform specifications and symbols for signs, markers, and traffic control devices established pursuant to Sections 890.6 and 890.8, except as provided in subdivision (b). (b) The department shall establish procedures to permit exceptions to the requirements of subdivision (a) for purposes of research, experimentation, testing, evaluation, or verification.  The department shall not deny funding to a project because it is excepted pursuant to this subdivision.   (c) The department, in cooperation with local agencies, shall, on or before June 30, 2015, establish minimum safety design criteria for Class IV bikeways, as designated in Section 890.4.