California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1202 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2013

Amended

Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 17, 2013