LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1202
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1202
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1202
Compare Versions
AB1202 Chaptered October 9, 2013
AB1202 Enrolled August 28, 2013
AB1202 Amended May 24, 2013
AB1202 Amended April 17, 2013
AB1202 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB1202 Chaptered October 9, 2013
AB1202 Enrolled August 28, 2013
AB1202 Amended May 24, 2013
AB1202 Amended April 17, 2013
AB1202 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare