Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2331.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 1705.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) . Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|