California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1263 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Amended

Bill July 10, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill June 13, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013