|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 307, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 2644.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1696.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 4. Page 1599.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|