California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1288 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013

Amended

Bill June 6, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013