|
10/07/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 623, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3305.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2357.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Galgiani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1578.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|