California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1319 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2013

Amended

Bill August 12, 2013
Bill June 26, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill March 18, 2013